Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Ayala

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹BornYécora
18 Jun 162560.4SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
18 Aug 162560.6ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
Dec 1625³60.9Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
22 Dec 162762.9SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
5 May 162863.3ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
19 Aug 163267.6DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Ayala:
Bishop Miguel Ayala (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,501
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 128, and Page 271
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 147, Number 937
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015