Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oleguer de Montserrat Rufet

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹BornBarcelona
23 May 168971.3AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
10 Jul 168971.5Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
19 Oct 169476.7DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oleguer de Montserrat Rufet:
Bishop Oleguer de Montserrat Rufet (born 1618, died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 399
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,095
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 231, Number 1,435
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015