Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeronimo López, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645²BornZaragoza
14 Nov 169550.8AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
12 Feb 169651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
21 Jun 169651.4DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jeronimo López:
Bishop Jeronimo López O.P. (born 1645, died ) Bishop of Barbastro

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 113
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,743
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 238, Number 1,476
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015