Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Jeronimo Fuenbuena, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628¹BornZaragoza
12 Dec 168254.9SelectedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
8 Mar 168355.1ConfirmedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
23 Aug 169971.6DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Jeronimo Fuenbuena:
Bishop Miguel Jeronimo Fuenbuena O.P. (born 1628, died ) Bishop of Albarracin

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 74
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,871
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 224, Number 1,387
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015