Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Ibáñez de la Riva Herrera

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635¹BornSolares
22 Dec 168449.9SelectedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
9 Apr 168550.2ConfirmedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
28 Apr 168752.3AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
3 Sep 171075.6DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ibáñez de la Riva Herrera:
Archbishop Antonio Ibáñez de la Riva Herrera (born 1635, died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 132, and Page 354
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 226, Number 1,407
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015