Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo Foncillas Mozárabe

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹BornLérida
27 Apr 170560.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
29 Jun 170560.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
8 May 171772.3DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Foncillas Mozárabe:
Bishop Mateo Foncillas Mozárabe (born 1645, died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,456
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 25, Number 43
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015