Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Armengual del Pino de la Mota

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1663BornMálaga
3 Jan 170137.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
3 Jan 170137.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
6 Mar 170137.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
6 May 171551.5AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
15 May 173066.5DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Armengual del Pino de la Mota:
Bishop Lorenzo Armengual del Pino de la Mota (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,326
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 20, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013