Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bravo Otálora de Lagunas

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1658BornLos Reyes
19 Nov 171456.3AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
21 Apr 171556.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
1722²63.4DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bravo Otálora de Lagunas:
Bishop Juan Bravo Otálora de Lagunas (born ) Bishop of Arequipa

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,640
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 32, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013