Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María Casiani, O.S.Bas. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664²BornMadrid, Spain
17 Sep 171450.7AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
19 Jan 171652.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
25 Nov 171753.8DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Casiani:
Bishop Antonio María Casiani O.S.Bas. (born 1664, died ) Bishop of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 33, Number 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015