Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Horcasitas y Avellaneda

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658¹BornBurgos
10 Feb 171557.1SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
18 Mar 171557.2ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
26 May 171557.4Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
21 Dec 171658.9DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Horcasitas y Avellaneda:
Bishop Antonio Horcasitas y Avellaneda (born 1658, died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 32, Number 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 10 Jul 2015