Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Fajardo (Guajardo), O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1664BornCórdoba, Spain
22 May 171348.8AppointedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jan 171651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
30 Sep 171652.1InstalledBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
16 Dec 172965.3DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Fajardo (Guajardo):
Bishop Pedro de Fajardo (Guajardo) O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013