Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Cavero de Toledo

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1720AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
11 Jun 1725AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
20 Mar 1741DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Cavero de Toledo:
Bishop Juan Cavero de Toledo (died ) Bishop of Arequipa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 97, and Page 176
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,706
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 41
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015