Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bravo del Rivero y Correa

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1685BornLima, Peru
1725²39.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
18 Feb 173448.7SelectedBishop of Santiago de Chile
9 Jul 173449.1ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Chile
22 May 173549.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
5 Apr 173650.8InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Oct 174257.4SelectedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
28 Jan 174357.6ConfirmedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
13 Nov 174358.4InstalledBishop of Arequipa, Peru
22 May 175266.9DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bravo del Rivero y Correa:
Bishop Juan Bravo del Rivero y Correa (born , died ) Bishop of Arequipa

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • bd/op/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,039
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 98, and Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 16 Oct 2013