Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Melchor de Liñán y Cisneros

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1629BornMadrid, Spain
6 Oct 166434.7AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
1665²35.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
26 Jan 166838.1AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
8 Feb 167242.1AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
14 Jun 167747.4AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
18 Feb 167848.1InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
28 Jun 170878.5DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchor de Liñán y Cisneros:
Archbishop Melchor de Liñán y Cisneros (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 244, and Page 317
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 320
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 201, Number 1,257
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015