Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Sanz Lozano

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1622BornCabanillas del Campo, Spain
19 Jun 165937.0SelectedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
10 Nov 165937.4ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
24 Mar 166138.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
19 Aug 168058.2AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
28 May 168866.0DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sanz Lozano:
Archbishop Antonio Sanz Lozano (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,434
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 137
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 193, Number 1,214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014