Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de León y Becerra

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1631²BornMadrid, Spain
1657²26.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 167241.2AppointedBishop of Panamá
29 Jul 167342.5Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
31 Mar 167645.2SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
19 Oct 167645.7ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
14 Jun 167746.4AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
28 Aug 170877.6DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de León y Becerra:
Bishop Antonio de León y Becerra (born 1631, died ) Bishop of Arequipa

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,705
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 210, Number 1,311
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015