Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan González de Santiago

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹BornSalamanca, Spain
9 Feb 170571.1AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
10 Apr 170773.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
12 Dec 170773.9DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan González de Santiago:
Bishop Juan González de Santiago (born 1634, died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,860
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 25, Number 42
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015