Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de Carrasco y Saavedra, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹Born
14 Mar 167854.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
1679²55.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
19 Jul 169470.5AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
1696¹72.0InstalledBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Aug 169773.6DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Carrasco y Saavedra (VIAF: 27098575)
Bishop Bernardo de Carrasco y Saavedra O.P. (born 1624, died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaña, Peru

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224, and Page 302
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 27
  • i: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017