Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alonso del Pozo y Silva

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1669¹Born
1694¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
1 Sep 171344.6SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
11 Dec 171344.9ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
10 Feb 171546.1Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
16 Jun 171546.4InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
22 Nov 172354.8AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
25 Sep 172556.7InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
24 Jul 173061.5AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
14 Aug 173162.6InstalledArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
22 Jan 174273.0ResignedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
17 Dec 174576.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Alonso del Pozo y Silva
Archbishop Alonso del Pozo y Silva (born 1669, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcepción, Diocese of Concepción, Chile
Ordained PriestSantiago, Diocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224, and Page 393
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341
  • op/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017