Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Montero del Aguila

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1645Born
3 May 169751.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
3 Oct 170863.0AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
5 Jan 171064.2Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
1711²65.2InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
21 Jan 171569.3AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
13 Jul 171670.7InstalledBishop of Trujillo, Peru
25 Feb 171872.3DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Montero del Aguila
Bishop Diego Montero del Aguila (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 20.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 167, and Page 393
  • opd/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017