Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Alday y Aspée

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1712Born
Feb 1740³28.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
26 Nov 175341.8AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
2 Oct 175543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
19 Feb 178876.0DiedBishop of Santiago de Chile

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Alday y Aspée (VIAF: 54180674)
Bishop Manuel de Alday y Aspée (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcepción

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,041
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 240
  • c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017