Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ángel de Espiñeira, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1727Born
1742²14.4EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
23 Nov 176134.3AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
21 Dec 176336.3Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
24 Feb 176436.5InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
9 Feb 177850.5DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ángel de Espiñeira (VIAF: 222774797)
Bishop Pedro Ángel de Espiñeira O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro de Vilarino, Spain

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 177
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 81, Number 406
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 33
  • ente: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017