Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan González Melgarejo

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1692¹BornAsuncion, Paraguay
1710¹18.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paraguay
22 Dec 174250.9SelectedBishop of Santiago de Chile
28 Jan 174351.0ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Chile
4 Nov 174452.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
26 Nov 175361.9AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
6 Mar 175462.1DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan González Melgarejo:
Bishop Juan González Melgarejo (born 1692, died ) Bishop of Arequipa

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 98, and Page 240
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015