Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gutiérrez Galeano, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1671BornLima
1694¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
3 Sep 173866.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
3 Sep 173866.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
20 Dec 173968.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
3 Nov 174473.0SelectedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
25 Jan 174573.3ConfirmedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
12 Oct 174877.0DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gutiérrez Galeano:
Bishop Francisco Gutiérrez Galeano O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230, and Page 358
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015