Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Toro y Zambrano

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1674²Born
1711²37.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
3 Nov 174470.8SelectedBishop of Concepción, Chile
18 Dec 174470.9ConfirmedBishop of Concepción, Chile
Jan 1746²72.0Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
1 May 176086.3DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Toro y Zambrano
Bishop José de Toro y Zambrano (born 1674, died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Diocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestSantiago, Diocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 177
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 1
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017