Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Quintian Ponte de Andrade

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1751Born
27 Jun 177827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
9 Sep 180554.2AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
2 Feb 180755.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
24 Jun 181362.0DiedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Andrés Quintian Ponte de Andrade (VIAF: 58800226)
Bishop Andrés Quintian Ponte de Andrade (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Coruña, Spain

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 159
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 127, Number 675
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017