Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime de Mimbela, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1666BornFraga, Spain
168215.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
169023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Feb 171447.8AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1715²48.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
20 Mar 172053.9AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
4 Aug 173973.3DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime de Mimbela:
Bishop Jaime de Mimbela O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 176, and Page 393
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 32, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013