Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lamberto Manuel López

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1658BornZaragoza
14 Mar 170142.7AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
17 Jul 170143.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
7 Apr 171758.8DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lamberto Manuel López:
Bishop Lamberto Manuel López (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 372
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 21, Number 13
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 25 Jun 2015