Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Gregorio Padilla

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Oct 1708AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
10 Mar 1709Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
24 Jun 1714SelectedBishop of Huesca, Spain
17 Sep 1714ConfirmedBishop of Huesca, Spain
24 Oct 1734DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Gregorio Padilla:
Bishop Pedro Gregorio Padilla (died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 27, Number 63
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 113, and Page 299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 25 Jun 2015