Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Granell

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹BornTortosa
1 Oct 171470.7AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
9 Dec 171470.9Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
7 Jun 171773.4DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Granell:
Bishop Pedro Granell (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Barbastro

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,490
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 31, Number 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015