Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Pérez Araciel y Rada

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1653¹BornAlfaro
28 Apr 170451.3AppointedBishop of León, Spain
27 Mar 171461.2SelectedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
13 Jun 171461.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
27 Sep 172673.7DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Pérez Araciel y Rada:
Archbishop Manuel Pérez Araciel y Rada (born 1653, died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 24, Number 34
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 132, and Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015