Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alamán Ferrer

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1666³BornNaval
11 Oct 171751.6AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
13 Feb 171851.9Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
10 May 173973.1DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alamán Ferrer:
Bishop Carlos Alamán Ferrer (born , died ) Bishop of Barbastro

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 36, Number 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015