Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio Gambaro

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1650BornNapoli
18 Mar 167323.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 167323.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 169343.8AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
27 Dec 169343.9Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
Oct 1721³71.6DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Biagio Gambaro:
Bishop Biagio Gambaro (born , died Oct 1721) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 374
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1693, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015