Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Morozzo, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1645Born
25 Feb 166823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
22 Dec 169348.8AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
27 Dec 169348.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
27 Jan 169852.9AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
14 Mar 172984.1DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Morozzo
Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Morozzo O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondový

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 122, and Page 341
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1693, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018