Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Luperti

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹BornCagli
19 Apr 169465.2AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
25 Apr 169465.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
23 Sep 170980.7DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Luperti:
Bishop Benedetto Luperti (born 1629, died ) Bishop of Cagli

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015