Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Azzolini

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1636³BornTorre di Palme
18 Dec 166024.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 169457.4AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
21 Mar 169457.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
16 Jun 169457.6DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Azzolini:
Bishop Francesco Azzolini (born , died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 29 Apr 2015