Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi (Ludovico) Capuani (Capulani)

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654¹BornNapoli
15 Mar 169440.2AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
21 Mar 169440.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
14 Dec 170551.9AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
13 Sep 170854.6DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi (Ludovico) Capuani (Capulani):
Bishop Luigi (Ludovico) Capuani (Capulani) (born 1654, died ) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 213, and Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 29 Apr 2015