Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Marzi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Titular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1647³BornTivoli
22 Dec 169346.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
22 Dec 169346.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
27 Dec 169346.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
Feb 171870.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giulio Marzi:
Bishop Giulio Marzi (born , died Feb 1718) Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 217
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1693, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015