Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Ottaviano Guasco

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1650Born
10 Jan 169545.0AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
16 Jan 169545.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
17 Nov 170454.8AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
21 Nov 171767.8DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Ottaviano Guasco
Bishop Carlo Ottaviano Guasco (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessandria

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 77, and Page 176
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018