Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Simeon Cavagnini

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1647³Born
24 Jan 169547.8AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
30 Jan 169547.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
Nov 1698³51.6DiedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Simeon Cavagnini
Bishop Joseph Simeon Cavagnini (born , died Nov 1698) Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSplit

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1695, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018