Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Petrus Draghi Bartoli

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1646³BornVenezia
28 Dec 167024.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 169044.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
19 Nov 169044.3Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
13 Apr 169548.7DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petrus Draghi Bartoli:
Patriarch Petrus Draghi Bartoli (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1690, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015