Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo Veraldi

Deceased

Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1650BornTaverna
9 Mar 169342.4AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
15 Mar 169342.4Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
Nov 1702³52.0DiedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Veraldi:
Bishop Michelangelo Veraldi (born , died Nov 1702) Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015