Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Vallaresso

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1660BornVenice
21 Apr 168525.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Nov 169232.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 169333.0AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
15 Mar 169333.0Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
23 Nov 172363.7DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Vallaresso:
Bishop Paolo Vallaresso (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015