Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Gagliani

Deceased

Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1655BornNapoli
20 Jul 169337.7AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
2 Aug 169337.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
15 Jan 170347.2AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
Sep 1717³61.8DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Gagliani:
Bishop Matteo Gagliani (born , died Sep 1717) Bishop of Sora

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 207, and Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015