Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto della Calce, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1649BornNapoli
3 Jun 169748.4AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
9 Jun 169748.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
13 Jul 171566.5DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto della Calce:
Bishop Giacinto della Calce C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 99
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015