Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele de Bologna, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1647BornSomma
Oct 166316.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
6 Mar 169042.4AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
12 Mar 169042.4Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
11 Dec 169851.2ResignedBishop of Isernia, Italy
14 Mar 170153.4AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
24 Feb 173183.4DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele de Bologna:
Archbishop Michele de Bologna C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,115
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 80, and Page 230
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015