Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Witham

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Marcopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1655Born
1688²32.6Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
12 Aug 170247.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
12 Aug 170247.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
15 Apr 170347.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
6 Apr 171660.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
16 Apr 172569.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Witham
Bishop George Witham (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCliffe Hall, Piercebridge, Darlington, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)
Ordained PriestSt. Gregory's, Paris, Diocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSt. Bartholomew, Seminary, Montefiascone, Diocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
Death PlaceCliffe Hall, Piercebridge, Darlington, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)Manfield, Darlington, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 256
  • op: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Jan 2018