Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Cianti

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1663BornRoma
29 Sep 169229.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 170137.6AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
Nov 170845.3DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Cianti:
Bishop Giuseppe Cianti (born ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 16.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013