Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Menatti

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1621BornDomaso
11 Sep 167352.3AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
1 Oct 167352.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
12 Feb 168967.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Mar 1692³70.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
15 Mar 170280.8DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Menatti (VIAF: 314889518)
Bishop Bartolomeo Menatti (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 238
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 26
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Nov 2016