Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Morelli

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1642Born
4 Apr 166523.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 168846.1AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
23 May 168846.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
1716²73.7DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Morelli
Bishop Domenico Morelli (born , died 1716) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoggiae

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast